NJ A810 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A660
Note: Carry Foward to future S2776
Note: Carry Over of previous A6053
Note: Carry Over of previous S4195
Note: Carry Foward to future S2776
Note: Carry Over of previous A6053
Note: Carry Over of previous S4195
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program to create student mental health assistance programs in selected school districts.
Title
Establishes pilot program to create student mental health assistance programs in selected school districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A810 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A810 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A6053 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1030 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S4195 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A810 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A6053 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1030 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S4195 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A810 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1000/810_I1.HTM |