NJ A660 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2831
Note: Carry Foward to future S2248
Note: Carry Over of previous A810
Note: Carry Over of previous S1030
Note: Carry Foward to future S2248
Note: Carry Over of previous A810
Note: Carry Over of previous S1030
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes pilot program to create student mental health assistance programs in selected school districts.
Title
Establishes pilot program to create student mental health assistance programs in selected school districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A660 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A660 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A810 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1030 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2776 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A660 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A810 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1030 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2776 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee