NJ A805 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5834

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S972 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns skilled and trained workforce in work by contractors in certain industries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns skilled and trained workforce in work by contractors in certain industries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblySubstituted by S972 (1R)
2020-06-15AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5834 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S972 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-6)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback