NJ S972 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5834

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns skilled and trained workforce in work by contractors in certain industries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns skilled and trained workforce in work by contractors in certain industries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
2020-02-10SenatePassed by the Senate (24-10)
2020-01-27SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A805 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A5834 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback