NJ A791 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2951

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires public institutions of higher education to grant academic credit to certain veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public institutions of higher education to grant academic credit to certain veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2018-09-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2951 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1618 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback