NJ A755 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A579
Note: Carry Foward to future S2478
Note: Carry Over of previous A3725
Note: Carry Foward to future S2478
Note: Carry Over of previous A3725
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires dealership to notify buyers of recalls on used motor vehicles for sale.
Title
Requires dealership to notify buyers of recalls on used motor vehicles for sale.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0) |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A755 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A755 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3725 (Carry Over) 2015-02-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S711 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A755 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3725 (Carry Over) 2015-02-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S711 (Same As) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/A755 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/A1000/755_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A755 |