NJ A3725 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A755
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires dealership to notify buyers of recalls on used motor vehicles for sale.
Title
Requires dealership to notify buyers of recalls on used motor vehicles for sale.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] |
Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-0-2) |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3725 (Carry Over) 2015-02-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2703 (Same As) 2015-01-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2703 (Same As) 2015-01-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee