NJ A681 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5395

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Passed on October 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Approved P.L.2021, c.248.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands scope of law prohibiting age discrimination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands scope of law prohibiting age discrimination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S397 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-05SenateApproved P.L.2021, c.248.
2021-06-21SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
2021-06-21SenateSubstituted for S397
2021-05-06SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
2021-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (71-0-0)
2021-01-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-03-05AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5395 (Carry Over) 2019-05-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S397 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A681

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback