NJ A6246 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.496.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.496.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns changes in control of hotels and disruptions of hotel services.
Title
Concerns changes in control of hotels and disruptions of hotel services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4295 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4295 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.496. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-16) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S4295 (1R) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (50-28-0) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4295 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6246 (1R)