NJ A6228 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4211 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4211 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes county college-based adult centers for transition for individuals with developmental disabilities; makes annual appropriation of $4.5 million.
Title
Establishes county college-based adult centers for transition for individuals with developmental disabilities; makes annual appropriation of $4.5 million.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S4211 (1R) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4211 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.425.