NJ A6219 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3673 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3673 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes limited breweries and craft distilleries to sell at retail and offer for sampling purposes product bottled and stored off-site under certain circumstances.
Title
Authorizes limited breweries and craft distilleries to sell at retail and offer for sampling purposes product bottled and stored off-site under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S3673 (1R) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3673 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.407.