NJ A617 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - Approved P.L.2015, c.119.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - Approved P.L.2015, c.119.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sending unsolicited advertising by text messaging, and requires companies offering text messaging services to allow customers to block all incoming and outgoing text messages.
Title
Prohibits sending unsolicited advertising by text messaging, and requires companies offering text messaging services to allow customers to block all incoming and outgoing text messages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1357 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1357 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1357 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S1357 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, c.119. |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2014-12-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2014-11-13 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2014-11-13 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2014-11-13 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Substituted for S1357 (1R) |
2014-09-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1357 (Same As) 2014-09-22 - Substituted by A617 (1R)