NJ A6150 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1800
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises penalties for transfer of certain professional and occupational licenses.
Title
Revises penalties for transfer of certain professional and occupational licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4119 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4119 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.482. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S4119 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6150 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.482.
S4119 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6150
S4119 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6150