NJ A6119 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4207 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4207 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns apprenticeship programs of public works contractors.
Title
Concerns apprenticeship programs of public works contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S4207 (3R) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4207 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.423.