NJ A6112 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S319
Note: Carry Foward to future A4685
Note: Carry Foward to future A4685
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4189 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4189 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits PERS retiree to return to elective public office after retirement under certain circurmstances.
Title
Permits PERS retiree to return to elective public office after retirement under certain circurmstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-03 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S4189 (1R) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6112 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4189 (1R)
A6112 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4189 (1R)
S4189 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A6112 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4189 (1R)
S4189 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session