NJ A6108 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.479.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.479.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates licenses offered by and certain licensure requirements from Board of Examiners of Electrical Contractors.
Title
Updates licenses offered by and certain licensure requirements from Board of Examiners of Electrical Contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4247 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4247 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.479. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-3-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-1) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted for S4247 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-5-0) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2021-12-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4247 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A6108 (1R)