NJ A6013 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S4071 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S4071 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Motorbus and Passenger Rail Service Employee Violence Prevention Act."
Title
"Motorbus and Passenger Rail Service Employee Violence Prevention Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S4071 (1R) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4071 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.352.