NJ A6011 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S4141 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S4141 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Paul's Law"; authorizes parent or guardian to request use of individualized health care plan for student with epilepsy or seizure disorder.
Title
"Paul's Law"; authorizes parent or guardian to request use of individualized health care plan for student with epilepsy or seizure disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S4141 (2R) |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4141 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.290.