NJ A5997 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.473.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.473.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes requirement for Legislature, DOE, free public libraries, and historical societies to purchase "Manual of the Legislature of New Jersey."
Title
Removes requirement for Legislature, DOE, free public libraries, and historical societies to purchase "Manual of the Legislature of New Jersey."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4084 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4084 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.473. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S4084 |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4084 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A5997