NJ A594 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A306
Note: Carry Foward to future S1648
Note: Carry Over of previous A230
Note: Carry Foward to future S1648
Note: Carry Over of previous A230
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Immunizes from civil liability first responders who forcibly enter property to provide emergency assistance.
Title
Immunizes from civil liability first responders who forcibly enter property to provide emergency assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A594 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A594 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A230 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3658 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A594 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A230 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3658 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/A594 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/A1000/594_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A594 |