NJ A5930 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3968 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S3968 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases purchasing threshold permitting Director of Division of Purchase and Property to delegate authority to agencies; increases bid advertising threshold on certain contracts by same scale.
Title
Increases purchasing threshold permitting Director of Division of Purchase and Property to delegate authority to agencies; increases bid advertising threshold on certain contracts by same scale.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S3968 (1R) |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3968 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.412.