NJ A5832 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A804
Note: Carry Foward to future S527
Note: Carry Foward to future S527
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State and county correctional facilities to offer inmates hepatitis B and hepatitis C testing.
Title
Requires State and county correctional facilities to offer inmates hepatitis B and hepatitis C testing.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-4-1) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5832 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5832 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S4148 (Same As) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5832 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S4148 (Same As) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee