NJ A804 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5832

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-07 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires State and county correctional facilities to offer inmates hepatitis B and hepatitis C testing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires State and county correctional facilities to offer inmates hepatitis B and hepatitis C testing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-07AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5832 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S527 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback