NJ A5823 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.270.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Removes prohibition on voting by persons convicted of indictable offense who are on parole or probation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removes prohibition on voting by persons convicted of indictable offense who are on parole or probation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4260 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 24 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-18SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.270.
2019-12-16SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (22-17)
2019-12-16SenateSubstituted for S4260
2019-12-12SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-12-12SenateTransferred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
2019-12-05SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-11-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (48-24-0)
2019-11-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-11-14AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-11-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S4260 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5823

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback