NJ A5684 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A820
Note: Carry Foward to future S344
Note: Carry Foward to future S344
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides mortgage payment relief for residential property owners and small landlords during time of coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.
Title
Provides mortgage payment relief for residential property owners and small landlords during time of coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.
Sponsors
Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Housing Committee |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5684 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5684 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3669 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5684 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3669 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee