NJ A5375 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3899 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S3899 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows TPAF retiree to be employed, without TPAF reenrollment, by school district as certificated superintendent or administrator for more than two years when in best interests of school district.
Title
Allows TPAF retiree to be employed, without TPAF reenrollment, by school district as certificated superintendent or administrator for more than two years when in best interests of school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S3899 (1R) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3899 (Same As) 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.184.