NJ A5343 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.183.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Approved P.L.2021, c.183.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public community water systems to inventory and replace lead service lines within 10 years; provides for recoupment of costs by investor-owned public water systems.
Title
Requires public community water systems to inventory and replace lead service lines within 10 years; provides for recoupment of costs by investor-owned public water systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3398 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3398 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-22 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.183. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-2) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S3398 (1R) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-2) |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3398 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A5343 (2R)