NJ A5341 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.361.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.361.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Updates 2-1-1 telephone system information to include all current modes of public transit and information on access and usage.
Title
Updates 2-1-1 telephone system information to include all current modes of public transit and information on access and usage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3438 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3438 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.361. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3438 (1R) |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3438 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5341 (1R)