NJ A5324 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2982
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2982
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that child may not be excluded from public school based on membership in protected category under "Law Against Discrimination" or immigration status.
Title
Clarifies that child may not be excluded from public school based on membership in protected category under "Law Against Discrimination" or immigration status.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S2982 |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2982 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.311.