NJ A5321 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Approved P.L. 2019, c.128.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Approved P.L. 2019, c.128.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Sami's Law"; requires transportation network companies to issue, and drivers to display on vehicles, certain transportation network company identification. *
Title
"Sami's Law"; requires transportation network companies to issue, and drivers to display on vehicles, certain transportation network company identification. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3687 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3687 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Approved P.L. 2019, c.128. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (37-0) (Diegnan) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Amendment (37-0) (Diegnan) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3687 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3687 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - Substituted by A5321 (ACS)