NJ A5293 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes various changes to laws governing remediation of contaminated sites.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes to laws governing remediation of contaminated sites.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3682 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-20SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2019-06-20SenateSubstituted for S3682 (1R)
2019-06-20SenateSenate Amendment (31-0) (Smith)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-1)
2019-06-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-05-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3682 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5293 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback