NJ A5208 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1598
Note: Carry Foward to future A2813
Note: Carry Over of previous S3015
Note: Carry Over of previous A3471
Note: Carry Foward to future A2813
Note: Carry Over of previous S3015
Note: Carry Over of previous A3471
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates gallery space on State House grounds for display of certain art works.
Title
Creates gallery space on State House grounds for display of certain art works.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5208 (Carry Over) 2021-01-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A5208 (Carry Over) 2021-01-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S2058 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3015 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3471 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5208 (Carry Over) 2021-01-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S2058 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3015 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3471 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A5208 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A9999/5208_I1.HTM |