NJ A5166 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3451
Note: Carry Foward to future S2950
Note: Carry Foward to future S2950
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law concerning family leave to extend protection by reducing, over time, employee threshold from 30 employees to five employees in definition of employer.
Title
Revises law concerning family leave to extend protection by reducing, over time, employee threshold from 30 employees to five employees in definition of employer.
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] |
Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2023-12-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (44-27-0) |
2023-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-12-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-11-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5166 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A5166 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S3825 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A5166 (Carry Over) 2023-12-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S3825 (Same As) 2023-05-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee