NJ A509 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A931
Note: Carry Foward to future S3281
Note: Carry Over of previous A1141
Note: Carry Over of previous S3605
Note: Carry Foward to future S3281
Note: Carry Over of previous A1141
Note: Carry Over of previous S3605
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases from 18 to 21 age at which person is eligible to receive firearms purchaser identification.
Title
Increases from 18 to 21 age at which person is eligible to receive firearms purchaser identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (50-28-0) |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A509 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A509 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1141 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3605 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S504 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A509 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1141 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S3605 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S504 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee