NJ A5072 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Upgrades unlawful taking thefts in certain instances; requires penalties of restitution and community service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Upgrades unlawful taking thefts in certain instances; requires penalties of restitution and community service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-03-18AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-02-25AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3496 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback