NJ A5060 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on July 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - Approved P.L.2023, c.95.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on July 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-03 - Approved P.L.2023, c.95.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expands scope of school district employee sick leave.
Title
Expands scope of school district employee sick leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3440 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3440 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-03 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.95. |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-6) |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3440 |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-6-0) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3440 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - Substituted by A5060