NJ A5019 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3464 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises certain procedures for real estate foreclosure sales; alters adjournment of sale process.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises certain procedures for real estate foreclosure sales; alters adjournment of sale process.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted by S3464 (1R)
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-18AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-03-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-03-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
2019-02-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3464 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback