NJ A5001 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.67.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revises statute of limitations for residential mortgage foreclosures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises statute of limitations for residential mortgage foreclosures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3418 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.67.
2019-03-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
2019-03-25SenateSubstituted for S3418
2019-03-25SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-1)
2019-03-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-03-07AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
2019-02-14AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
2019-02-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3418 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A5001

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback