NJ A4948 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2807
Note: Carry Foward to future S296
Note: Carry Over of previous S906
Note: Carry Foward to future S296
Note: Carry Over of previous S906
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mail-in ballot applications to include prepaid postage.
Title
Requires mail-in ballot applications to include prepaid postage.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] | Rep. Reginald Atkins [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] |
Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. William Moen [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4948 (Carry Over) 2023-01-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4948 (Carry Over) 2023-01-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S906 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3365 (Same As) 2023-02-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4948 (Carry Over) 2023-01-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S906 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3365 (Same As) 2023-02-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee