NJ A4941 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Approved P.L.2021, c.10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Approved P.L.2021, c.10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes State Treasurer to sell and convey certain surplus real property located in Town of Secaucus, Hudson County.
Title
Authorizes State Treasurer to sell and convey certain surplus real property located in Town of Secaucus, Hudson County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3122 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.10. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Substituted for S3122 |
2020-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2020-11-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3122 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - Substituted by A4941