NJ A4941 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2660
Note: Carry Foward to future S1911
Note: Carry Foward to future S1911
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Health to establish maternity care public awareness campaign.*
Title
Requires Commissioner of Health to establish maternity care public awareness campaign.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4941 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A4941 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3370 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Senate Amendment (33-0) (Cruz-Perez)
A4941 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3370 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Senate Amendment (33-0) (Cruz-Perez)