NJ A4890 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1666
Note: Carry Foward to future S2029
Note: Carry Foward to future S2029
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes High Efficiency Accelerated Learning Grant Program and Tutoring Advisory Commission.
Title
Establishes High Efficiency Accelerated Learning Grant Program and Tutoring Advisory Commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Brandon Umba [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-08 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4890 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4890 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3220 (Same As) 2023-01-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4890 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3220 (Same As) 2023-01-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee