NJ A4883 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires hospitals to include warning in patient discharge papers concerning risks of addiction and overdose associated with opioid medications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires hospitals to include warning in patient discharge papers concerning risks of addiction and overdose associated with opioid medications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
2019-02-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-15AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3342 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback