NJ A4846 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1053
Note: Carry Foward to future S1429
Note: Carry Foward to future S1429
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises and expands laws on trespass and vandalism on agricultural and horticultural lands.*
Title
Revises and expands laws on trespass and vandalism on agricultural and horticultural lands.*
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] |
Sen. Diane Allen [R] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3617 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3617 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S3617 (1R) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-1-0) |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4846 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
A4846 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
S3617 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4846 (1R)
A4846 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
S3617 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4846 (1R)