NJ A4814 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows mail-in voter to cure mail-in ballot due to missing certificate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows mail-in voter to cure mail-in ballot due to missing certificate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-15SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2021-11-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-06-28SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
2021-06-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (50-25-0)
2021-06-16AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-06-16AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-10-19AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3039 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback