NJ A4810 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1455
Note: Carry Foward to future A4161
Note: Carry Over of previous S4125
Note: Carry Foward to future A4161
Note: Carry Over of previous S4125
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Government Efficiency and Regulatory Review Commission.
Title
Establishes Government Efficiency and Regulatory Review Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S441 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S441 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Substituted for S441 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2020-11-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-1-0) |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4810 (Carry Over) 2021-05-05 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A4810 (Carry Over) 2021-05-05 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S441 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Substituted by A4810
S4125 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4810 (Carry Over) 2021-05-05 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
S441 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Substituted by A4810
S4125 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee