NJ A4807 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Waives shared responsibility tax payments for certain individuals without minimum essential health benefits coverage during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.
Title
Waives shared responsibility tax payments for certain individuals without minimum essential health benefits coverage during coronavirus disease 2019 pandemic.
Sponsors
Rep. John Armato [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] |
Rep. Robert Auth [R] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2020-10-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3116 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee