NJ A4800 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-21 - Substituted by S3011 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-21 - Substituted by S3011 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns use of ignition interlock devices for drunk driving offenses.
Title
Concerns use of ignition interlock devices for drunk driving offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S3011 (4R) |
2023-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-12-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-06-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-06-20 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2022-10-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3011 (Same As) 2023-12-21 - Approved P.L.2023, c.191.