NJ A4707 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S2964
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S2964
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits residential substance use disorder treatment facilities and aftercare facilities from denying admission to individuals receiving medication assisted treatment for substance use disorder.
Title
Prohibits residential substance use disorder treatment facilities and aftercare facilities from denying admission to individuals receiving medication assisted treatment for substance use disorder.
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Substituted by S2964 |
2017-11-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2964 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.256.