NJ A4705 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S67
Note: Carry Foward to future A3824
Note: Carry Foward to future A3824
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-22 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes system for portable benefits for workers who provide services to consumers through contracting agents.
Title
Establishes system for portable benefits for workers who provide services to consumers through contracting agents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4705 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle)
A4705 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle)
A4705 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle)